NY A06994 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun and establishes procedures for the application, administration, and expiration or termination of such protection orders.
Title
Establishes extreme risk protection orders as a court-issued order of protection prohibiting a person from purchasing, possessing or attempting to purchase or possess a firearm, rifle or shotgun and establishes procedures for the application, administration, and expiration or termination of such protection orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.151 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.151 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05447 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN