NY A06991 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the affidavit of the lawful immigration status requirement for certain students.
Title
Removes the affidavit of the lawful immigration status requirement for certain students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08365 (Same As) 2024-01-23 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION