NY A06990 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - print number 6990a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - print number 6990a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of the regional state park police.
Title
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of the regional state park police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | print number 6990a |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05556 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A