NY A06989 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain licenses to brew or sell beer to include the certificate of authority number.
Title
Requires certain licenses to brew or sell beer to include the certificate of authority number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.64 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.367 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.168 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6989 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.156 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.591 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4661 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.168 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S04661 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.64