NY A06987 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - print number 6987a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - print number 6987a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the awarding of state contracts for professional services under the minority and women-owned business enterprise program.
Title
Provides for the awarding of state contracts for professional services under the minority and women-owned business enterprise program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Assembly | print number 6987a |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01115 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 1115A