NY A06986 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of health of the state of New York to conduct a study of the effects of racial and ethnic disparities on breastfeeding rates and prepare and submit a report to the governor and the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of health of the state of New York to conduct a study of the effects of racial and ethnic disparities on breastfeeding rates and prepare and submit a report to the governor and the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-03-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-03-04Senate3RD READING CAL.479
2020-03-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6707
2020-02-05SenateREFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
2020-02-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-02-05Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.251
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.383
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.383
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-28Assemblyprint number 6986a
2019-05-28Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-04-03Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06707 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6986A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6986
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06986&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06986
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06986&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06986A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06986&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06986&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06986&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6986#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback