NY A06983 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Title
Relates to proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex trafficking, labor trafficking and compelling prostitution and provides for confidentiality of records of such proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6983b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.249 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.536 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | print number 6983a |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04981 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 4981B