NY A06978 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to the resolution of labor disputes.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions of law relating to the resolution of labor disputes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.28 |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4738 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.438 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04738 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6978