NY A06977 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Grants William J. Cooley additional service credit within the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.235 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6977 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1428 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4724 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.624 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04724 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.235