NY A06976 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the name and telephone number of the mortgage servicer for a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action involving a one- to four-family residential property on certain documents pertaining to such action.
Title
Relates to including the name and telephone number of the mortgage servicer for a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action involving a one- to four-family residential property on certain documents pertaining to such action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.269 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.234 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a6976 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.417 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4190 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.234 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04190 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.269