NY A06974 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - print number 6974a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - print number 6974a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public retirement systems to post board meeting minutes on their websites to the extent practicable or otherwise required by law.
Title
Requires public retirement systems to post board meeting minutes on their websites to the extent practicable or otherwise required by law.
Sponsors
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Assembly | print number 6974a |
2020-07-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00272 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental employees