NY A06973 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to split shifts for election inspectors or poll clerks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to split shifts for election inspectors or poll clerks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-17Assemblyprint number 6973a
2024-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to election law
2023-05-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S00609 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback