NY A06972 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the actions of the Panama central school district regardless of the failure of such district to timely file final building cost reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1798 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.807 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01798 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - VETOED MEMO.42