NY A06971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.
Title
Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.254 |
2019-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a6971b |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.768 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 218B |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 218A |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s218b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.157 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 6971b |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | print number 6971a |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00218 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.254