NY A06971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring anaphylactic policies for child care services setting forth guidelines and procedures to be followed for both the prevention of anaphylaxis and during a medical emergency resulting from anaphylaxis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 6971b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-04-03Assemblyprint number 6971a
2019-04-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2019-03-29Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S00218 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback