NY A06970 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic absentee ballot application transmittal system through which voters may apply for and submit an absentee ballot online.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic absentee ballot application transmittal system through which voters may apply for and submit an absentee ballot online.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1356
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6482B
2021-05-26SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-05-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-26Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-19Assemblyamended on third reading 6970a
2021-04-29Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.271
2021-04-28Assemblyreported
2021-04-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-04-16Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S06482 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6970A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A6970
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06970&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06970
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06970&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06970A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06970&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06970&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06970&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A6970#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback