NY A06967 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.
Title
Requires landlords to mitigate damages if a tenant vacates a premises in violation of the terms of the lease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.485 |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |