NY A06965 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the commissioner of health to appoint a temporary operator of a hospital or adult care facility where there are conditions within the facility that seriously endanger the life, health or safety of residents or patients.
Title
Extends the authority of the commissioner of health to appoint a temporary operator of a hospital or adult care facility where there are conditions within the facility that seriously endanger the life, health or safety of residents or patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.229 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.333 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | referred to health |