NY A06959 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s6755a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Warwick, county of Orange to alienate certain lands held in public trust in the town of Warwick, county of Orange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Warwick, county of Orange to alienate certain lands held in public trust in the town of Warwick, county of Orange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s6755a
2023-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.855
2023-06-10Assemblyreported
2023-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-06-07Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2023-06-05Assemblyprint number 6959a
2023-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to local governments
2023-05-09Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06755 (Same As) 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.203

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback