NY A06958 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - print number 6958b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - print number 6958b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Title
Defines the practice of certified registered nurse anesthetist; requires collaboration with a licensed physician qualified to determine the need for anesthesia services; requires licensing; defines qualifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6958b |
2024-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | print number 6958a |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00769 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 769B