NY A06958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Lois J. Reid to reapply for ordinary disability retirement benefits.
Title
Authorizes Lois J. Reid to reapply for ordinary disability retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Asm. Raymond Walter [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. David DiPietro [R] |
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | print number 6958a |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04252 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - referred to governmental employees