NY A06956 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - print number 6956b
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - print number 6956b
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the results of any outage management system stress test conducted in the state by a utility company to be posted online and such results to be sent to the temporary president of the senate, the speaker of the assembly and the chairs of the senate and assembly standing committees on energy.
Title
Requires the results of any outage management system stress test conducted in the state by a utility company to be posted online and such results to be sent to the temporary president of the senate, the speaker of the assembly and the chairs of the senate and assembly standing committees on energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | print number 6956b |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | print number 6956a |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04515 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS