NY A06954 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a deceased tenant's legal representative the option to terminate such tenant's lease upon notice to the landlord.
Title
Provides a deceased tenant's legal representative the option to terminate such tenant's lease upon notice to the landlord.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.303 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.303 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 6954c |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | print number 6954b |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-07-09 | Assembly | print number 6954a |
2021-07-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05746 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES