NY A06954 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5422a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5422a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in Nassau, Suffolk and Westchester counties on and after July 1, 2018 be bioheating fuel that contains at least five percent biodiesel.
Title
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in Nassau, Suffolk and Westchester counties on and after July 1, 2018 be bioheating fuel that contains at least five percent biodiesel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5422a |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6954a |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.678 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.678 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05422 (Same As) 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.315