NY A06953 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Cortland to impose a tax of one dollar per five hundred dollars on real estate transfers.
Title
Authorizes the county of Cortland to impose a tax of one dollar per five hundred dollars on real estate transfers.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.403 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.403 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.596 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.596 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | print number 6953a |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06167 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE