NY A06945 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exemptions from the compensating use tax for tastings held by a licensed brewery, farm brewery, cider producer, farm cidery, distillery or farm distillery in accordance with the alcoholic beverage control law.
Title
Relates to exemptions from the compensating use tax for tastings held by a licensed brewery, farm brewery, cider producer, farm cidery, distillery or farm distillery in accordance with the alcoholic beverage control law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | approval memo.31 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | signed chap.418 |
2017-11-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2120 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3387A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | print number 6945a |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03387 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6945A