NY A06941 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - signed chap.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - signed chap.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications of certain county probation officer directors.
Title
Relates to the qualifications of certain county probation officer directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | signed chap.530 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4757 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.549 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.549 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04757 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6941