NY A06938 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-22 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-22 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of labor to prepare an annual report on the cost of living, poverty rates and adequacy of the current minimum wage in the state.
Title
Requires the commissioner of labor to prepare an annual report on the cost of living, poverty rates and adequacy of the current minimum wage in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06646 (Same As) 2024-04-17 - referred to labor