NY A06936 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits beneficiaries of correction officers employed by Nassau county to elect to receive, in a lump sum, an amount payable equal to the pension reserve that would have been established had the member retired on the date of his or her death, or the value of the death benefit and the reserve-for-increased-take-home-pay, whichever is greater.
Title
Permits beneficiaries of correction officers employed by Nassau county to elect to receive, in a lump sum, an amount payable equal to the pension reserve that would have been established had the member retired on the date of his or her death, or the value of the death benefit and the reserve-for-increased-take-home-pay, whichever is greater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s4440 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.672 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04440 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.534