NY A06931 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - print number 6931a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Rebecca Leonard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to granting retroactive tier IV membership in the NY state and local employees' retirement system for Rebecca Leonard.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05Assemblyprint number 6931a
2020-02-05Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-03-27Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S04366 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4366A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback