NY A06922 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.427
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the enforcement of state court judgments; provides that such judgment shall be deemed entered and docketed on the day immediately preceding the date of such determination for the purpose of establishing the priority against a judicial lien on such property.
Title
Relates to the enforcement of state court judgments; provides that such judgment shall be deemed entered and docketed on the day immediately preceding the date of such determination for the purpose of establishing the priority against a judicial lien on such property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.427 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-08 | 3RD READING CAL.712 | |
2010-06-08 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4536 | |
2010-03-04 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-03-04 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-04 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.460 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-06 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-05-06 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-06 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.481 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-03-17 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S4536 (Same As) 2010-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6922