NY A06919 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of military and naval affairs to establish policies relating to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers.
Title
Directs the division of military and naval affairs to establish policies relating to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. David DiPietro [R] |
Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R] | Asm. Marc Butler [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Joseph Errigo [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02920 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE