NY A06918 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers; provides that personnel be permitted to carry a firearm.
Title
Relates to security and protection of New York national guard and air national guard recruiting centers; provides that personnel be permitted to carry a firearm.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | print number 6918a |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02921 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - referred to governmental operations