NY A06910 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s6173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - substituted by s6173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Michael Durso [R] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Michael Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6173 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.270 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06173 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.174