NY A06907 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the district attorney in the county of Oneida to appoint five stenographers to take and transcribe the testimony given before grand juries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the district attorney in the county of Oneida to appoint five stenographers to take and transcribe the testimony given before grand juries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-15Assemblysigned chap.410
2023-09-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-01SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-01Senate3RD READING CAL.797
2023-06-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6591
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2023-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.275
2023-05-24Assemblyrules report cal.275
2023-05-24Assemblyreported
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-09Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06591 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6907

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback