NY A06907 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.293
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits boards of elections to allow election inspectors to work split shifts; their compensation shall be adjusted accordingly.
Title
Permits boards of elections to allow election inspectors to work split shifts; their compensation shall be adjusted accordingly.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Pamela Harris [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.293 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-05-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.311 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S443A |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.356 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | print number 6907a |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00443 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6907A