NY A06899 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility and awards to certain family members for crime scene clean-up.
Title
Relates to eligibility and awards to certain family members for crime scene clean-up.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | Senate | signed chap.119 |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1005 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4345 |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.490 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04345 (Same As) 2013-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6899