NY A06899 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - print number 6899c
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - print number 6899c
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of ultra low sulfur diesel fuel and the best available technology by the state.
Title
Relates to the use of ultra low sulfur diesel fuel and the best available technology by the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Assembly | print number 6899c |
2012-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | print number 6899b |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6899a |
2011-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02369 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION