NY A06896 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.109
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards, departments and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards, departments and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.109 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.745 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1793 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6639A |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.594 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.594 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6896a |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06639 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6896A