NY A06893 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.49
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York seafood marketing task force act of 2017"; defines terms; establishes a task force consisting of eighteen members; outlines the powers and duties of such collaborative; requires that the task force provide a report of its findings addressing the research, marketing, expansion and funding opportunities for local seafood; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "New York seafood marketing task force act of 2017"; defines terms; establishes a task force consisting of eighteen members; outlines the powers and duties of such collaborative; requires that the task force provide a report of its findings addressing the research, marketing, expansion and funding opportunities for local seafood; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.49 |
2017-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.478 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.816 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5385A |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.294 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6893a |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2017-03-24 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05385 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6893A