NY A06888 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s4089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - substituted by s4089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop and conduct a public awareness campaign regarding Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.
Title
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to develop and conduct a public awareness campaign regarding Lyme disease and other tick-borne diseases.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted by s4089 |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.269 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04089 (Same As) 2021-12-01 - SIGNED CHAP.648