NY A06875 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - substituted by s4530b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes guidelines for information subpoenas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes guidelines for information subpoenas.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-22Assemblysubstituted by s4530b
2011-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.573
2011-06-21Assemblyrules report cal.573
2011-06-21Assemblyreported
2011-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 6875b
2011-06-15Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-14Assemblyprint number 6875a
2011-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2011-04-05Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S04530 (Same As) 2011-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.342

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback