NY A06868 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the people's history project within the department of parks, recreation and historic preservation to foster the recognition of heretofore overlooked personages, sites, and events of historical significance; provides for the establishment of a committee to pass on nominations made by the citizens of this state for the inclusion of personages, sites, and events in the project; provides for suitable commemorative markers, a map and website listings of such.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the people's history project within the department of parks, recreation and historic preservation to foster the recognition of heretofore overlooked personages, sites, and events of historical significance; provides for the establishment of a committee to pass on nominations made by the citizens of this state for the inclusion of personages, sites, and events in the project; provides for suitable commemorative markers, a map and website listings of such.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1937
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6246A
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.157
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.157
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-31Assemblyprint number 6868a
2018-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2017-03-22Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S06246 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6868A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06868
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06868A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06868&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6868#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback