NY A06866 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the court shall confirm an award in a public sector arbitration proceeding upon application of a party made within one year after delivery to the party, unless an application to vacate or modify the award upon certain grounds is made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the court shall confirm an award in a public sector arbitration proceeding upon application of a party made within one year after delivery to the party, unless an application to vacate or modify the award upon certain grounds is made.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted by s6491
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.538
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06491 (Same As) 2023-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.679

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback