NY A06847 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the village and town of Skaneateles in the county of Onondaga to adopt, amend and enforce certain rules and regulations regarding the construction and location of boathouses, moorings and docks.
Title
Allows the village and town of Skaneateles in the county of Onondaga to adopt, amend and enforce certain rules and regulations regarding the construction and location of boathouses, moorings and docks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1767 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01767 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - SIGNED CHAP.569