NY A06842 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons 60 years or older to keep and care for common household pets in municipal housing; prevents eviction of such persons based on the ownership of pets; provides that any pet who poses a nuisance to the community may be removed; does not remove any pet owner from liability for the reasonable costs directly attributable to any damage caused by the pet.
Title
Allows persons 60 years or older to keep and care for common household pets in municipal housing; prevents eviction of such persons based on the ownership of pets; provides that any pet who poses a nuisance to the community may be removed; does not remove any pet owner from liability for the reasonable costs directly attributable to any damage caused by the pet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | print number 6842a |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03551 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - referred to housing