NY A06841 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.562
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the enforcement of the collection of delinquent real property taxes and the collection of taxes by banks; enforces the collection of taxes in certain villages.
Title
Extends the enforcement of the collection of delinquent real property taxes and the collection of taxes by banks; enforces the collection of taxes in certain villages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Assembly | signed chap.562 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1404 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6720 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.220 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06720 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6841