NY A06838 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-2)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - substituted by s5337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - substituted by s5337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to body imaging scanning equipment including proper registration, limitations and reporting of use.
Title
Relates to body imaging scanning equipment including proper registration, limitations and reporting of use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s5337 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05337 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.313