NY A06833 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.572
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to violations of the human rights law by a real estate appraiser.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to violations of the human rights law by a real estate appraiser.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25Assemblysigned chap.572
2023-10-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1656
2023-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7175
2023-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.600
2023-06-06Assemblyrules report cal.600
2023-06-06Assemblyreported
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07175 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6833

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6833
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06833&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06833
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06833&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06833&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06833&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6833#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06833&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback