NY A06809 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to testamentary disposition to trustee under, or in accordance with, terms of existing inter vivos trust and the timing of the transfer of assets and signing of the will.
Title
Relates to testamentary disposition to trustee under, or in accordance with, terms of existing inter vivos trust and the timing of the transfer of assets and signing of the will.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.476 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.235 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |